MI HB5477 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-26 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
Pending: Senate Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Food: other; sale of food items represented to be kratom products; regulate. Creates new act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Food: other; sale of food items represented to be kratom products; regulate. Creates new act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-05-25 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 269 (Y: 88 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-26SenateReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2022-05-25HouseTransmitted
2022-05-25HouseTitle Amended
2022-05-25HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 269 Yeas 88 Nays 19 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
2022-05-25HouseSubstitute (h-3) Adopted
2022-05-25HouseRead A Third Time
2022-05-19HousePlaced On Third Reading
2022-05-19HouseSubstitute (h-2) Adopted
2022-05-19HouseRead A Second Time
2022-04-13HouseReferred To Second Reading
2022-04-13HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2)
2022-03-08HouseReferred To Committee On Rules And Competitiveness
2021-10-26HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 10/21/2021
2021-10-21HouseReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2021-10-21HouseRead A First Time
2021-10-21HouseIntroduced By Representative Lori Stone

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2021-HB-5477
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billintroduced/House/htm/2021-HIB-5477.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/House/htm/2021-HEBH-5477.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-HCVBS-5477-0N296.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-HCVBS-5477-0O3312.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-HCVBS-5477-0O339.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-5477-EC6AEE23.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-5477-ABF4F7EA.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-5477-L.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-5477-A2FED901.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2022-HJ-04-13-033.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2022-HJ-05-25-048.htm

Bill Comments

feedback