MI HB5469 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-15)
Status: Passed on December 31 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-12-31 - Assigned Pa 240'09 With Immediate Effect 2009 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-15)
Status: Passed on December 31 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-12-31 - Assigned Pa 240'09 With Immediate Effect 2009 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Michigan business tax; credit; additional credit for cell manufacturing facility and advanced battery pack manufacturing; provide for. Amends sec. 434 of 2007 PA 36 (MCL 208.1434). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0818'09
Title
Michigan business tax; credit; additional credit for cell manufacturing facility and advanced battery pack manufacturing; provide for. Amends sec. 434 of 2007 PA 36 (MCL 208.1434). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0818'09
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-12-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-11-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-11-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-12-31 | Assigned Pa 240'09 With Immediate Effect 2009 Addenda | |
2009-12-31 | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/8/2010 @ 3:37 Pm 2009 Addenda | |
2009-12-31 | Approved By The Governor 1/8/2010 @ 3:07 Pm 2009 Addenda | |
2009-12-30 | Presented To The Governor 12/29/2009 @ 10:18 Am | |
2009-12-17 | Bill Ordered Enrolled | |
2009-12-17 | Full Title Agreed To | |
2009-12-17 | Roll Call # 676 Yeas 96 Nays 6 | |
2009-12-17 | Senate Substitute S-3 Concurred In | |
2009-12-17 | Rule Suspended | |
2009-12-17 | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules | |
2009-12-17 | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-3 With Immediate Effect And Full Title | |
2009-12-17 | Inserted Full Title | |
2009-12-17 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 729 Yeas 32 Nays 3 Excused 1 Not Voting 2 | |
2009-12-17 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-12-17 | Rules Suspended | |
2009-12-17 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-3 | |
2009-12-17 | Substitute S-3 Concurred In | |
2009-12-17 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-3 | |
2009-12-17 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 | |
2009-12-17 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2009-12-17 | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 | |
2009-12-01 | Referred To Committee On Commerce And Tourism | |
2009-11-12 | Transmitted | |
2009-11-12 | Title Amended | |
2009-11-12 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 552 Yeas 88 Nays 12 | |
2009-11-12 | Read A Third Time | |
2009-11-12 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-11-12 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2009-11-12 | Substitute H-2 Adopted | |
2009-11-12 | Read A Second Time | |
2009-11-04 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2009-11-04 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 | |
2009-09-29 | Printed Bill Filed 09/28/2009 | |
2009-09-25 | Referred To Committee On New Economy And Quality Of Life | |
2009-09-25 | Read A First Time | |
2009-09-25 | Introduced By Representative Ed Clemente |