MI HB5466 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 468'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Construction; contracts; certain indemnification provisions; prohibit in construction-related service contracts with public agencies. Amends sec. 1 of 1966 PA 165 (MCL 691.991).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Construction; contracts; certain indemnification provisions; prohibit in construction-related service contracts with public agencies. Amends sec. 1 of 1966 PA 165 (MCL 691.991).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 836 (Y: 86 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 889 (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-4 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 377 (Y: 87 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-12-31HouseAssigned Pa 468'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
2012-12-31HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 12/27/2012 @ 3:36 Pm 2012 Addenda
2012-12-31HouseApproved By The Governor 12/22/2012 @ 11:36 Am 2012 Addenda
2012-12-27HousePresented To The Governor 12/20/2012 @ 2:58 Pm
2012-12-13HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2012-12-13House Roll Call # 836 Yeas 86 Nays 23
2012-12-13HouseSenate Substitute S-5 Concurred In
2012-12-12HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2012-12-12HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute S-5 With Immediate Effect
2012-12-12SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 889 Yeas 28 Nays 8 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
2012-12-12SenateAmendment(s) Adopted
2012-12-04SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-5
2012-12-04SenateSubstitute S-5 Concurred In
2012-12-04SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-5
2012-11-29SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-4
2012-11-29SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2012-11-29SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-4
2012-06-12SenateReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2012-06-07HouseTransmitted
2012-06-07HouseTitle Amended
2012-06-07HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 377 Yeas 87 Nays 21
2012-06-07HouseRead A Third Time
2012-06-06HousePlaced On Third Reading
2012-06-06HouseSubstitute H-1 Adopted And Amended
2012-06-06HouseRead A Second Time
2012-05-10HouseReferred To Second Reading
2012-05-10HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1
2012-03-15HousePrinted Bill Filed 03/14/2012
2012-03-13HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2012-03-13HouseRead A First Time
2012-03-13HouseIntroduced By Representative Kurt Heise

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2012-HB-5466
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billintroduced/House/htm/2012-HIB-5466.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billengrossed/House/htm/2012-HEBH-5466.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billengrossed/House/htm/2012-HEBS-5466.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billenrolled/House/htm/2012-HNB-5466.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/publicact/htm/2012-PA-0468.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-05-10-046.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-06-07-059.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2012-SJ-11-29-074.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2012-SJ-12-12-079.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-12-13-082.htm

Bill Comments

feedback