MI HB5463 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Assigned Pa 136'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Assigned Pa 136'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health; hazardous products; sale or delivery of nitrous oxide to individuals under the age of 18; prohibit, and provide remedies. Amends sec. 2a of 1967 PA 119 (MCL 752.272a). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5464'18
Title
Health; hazardous products; sale or delivery of nitrous oxide to individuals under the age of 18; prohibit, and provide remedies. Amends sec. 2a of 1967 PA 119 (MCL 752.272a). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5464'18
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 227 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 151 (Y: 104 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 151 (Y: 104 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | House | Assigned Pa 136'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-05-10 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 5/10/2018 @ 10:46 Am |
2018-05-10 | House | Approved By The Governor 5/9/2018 @ 3:32 Pm |
2018-05-01 | House | Presented To The Governor 4/26/2018 @ 3:54 Pm |
2018-04-24 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-04-24 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 227 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2018-03-08 | House | Transmitted |
2018-03-08 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 151 Yeas 104 Nays 3 |
2018-03-08 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-03-07 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-02-28 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-02-28 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-01-31 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/30/2018 |
2018-01-30 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2018-01-30 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-01-30 | House | Introduced By Representative Stephanie Chang |