MI HB5454 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-15 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy
Pending: Senate Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-15 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy
Pending: Senate Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicles; emergency vehicles; part-time licensure for advanced life support; provide for ambulance service. Amends secs. 20920 & 20921 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.20920 & 333.20921).
Title
Vehicles; emergency vehicles; part-time licensure for advanced life support; provide for ambulance service. Amends secs. 20920 & 20921 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.20920 & 333.20921).
Sponsors
Rep. John Kivela [D] | Rep. Scott Dianda [D] | Rep. Gail Haines [R] | Sen. Ed McBroom [R] |
Rep. Robert Kosowski [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-12-11 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 677 (Y: 95 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2014-12-11 | House | Transmitted |
2014-12-11 | House | Title Amended |
2014-12-11 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 677 Yeas 95 Nays 11 |
2014-12-11 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-12-11 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-12-11 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-12-11 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2014-12-11 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-12-11 | House | Placed On Second Reading |
2014-12-11 | House | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved |
2014-12-11 | House | Rule Suspended |
2014-04-23 | House | Printed Bill Filed 04/18/2014 |
2014-04-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2014-04-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-04-17 | House | Introduced By Representative John Kivela |
Subjects
Health facilities, emergency medical services
Health, emergency services
Occupations, emergency medical services personnel
Vehicles, emergency vehicles
Health, emergency services
Occupations, emergency medical services personnel
Vehicles, emergency vehicles