MI HB5445 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-2)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-2)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Public utilities; public service commission; registration procedure for electric vehicle charging stations; provide for. Creates new act.
Title
Public utilities; public service commission; registration procedure for electric vehicle charging stations; provide for. Creates new act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-2) |
2020-02-05 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/05/2020 |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred To Committee On Energy |
2020-02-04 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-02-04 | House | Introduced By Representative Andrea Schroeder |
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2020-HB-5445 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2020-HIB-5445.htm |