MI HB5425 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-02 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-02 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure: sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for failure to originate and record certain bottle deposits with intent to defraud or cheat; create. Amends sec. 14h, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.14h).
Title
Criminal procedure: sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for failure to originate and record certain bottle deposits with intent to defraud or cheat; create. Amends sec. 14h, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.14h).
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Sneller [D] | Rep. Jim Lilly [R] | Rep. John Chirkun [D] | Rep. Brandt Iden [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-02 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-12-02 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2020-12-01 | House | Re-referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2020-03-12 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-03-12 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-03-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-03-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2020-01-29 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/29/2020 |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2020-01-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-01-28 | House | Introduced By Representative Tim Sneller |