MI HB5418 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-31 - Assigned Pa 364'20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-31 - Assigned Pa 364'20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Education: school districts; filing, storage, and notice rules regarding do-not-resuscitate orders and POST forms and limitation of liability for certain persons; provide for. Amends 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1 - 380.1852) by adding secs. 1180 & 1181. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5417'20
Title
Education: school districts; filing, storage, and notice rules regarding do-not-resuscitate orders and POST forms and limitation of liability for certain persons; provide for. Amends 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1 - 380.1852) by adding secs. 1180 & 1181. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5417'20
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 597 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 202 (Y: 103 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 202 (Y: 103 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 364'20 |
2020-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 01/04/2021 12:20 Pm |
2020-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 01/04/2021 10:12 Am |
2020-12-21 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/22/2020 07:09 Pm |
2020-12-21 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-12-21 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-12-21 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 597 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2020-07-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2020-07-23 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-07-23 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors, And Veterans |
2020-05-19 | House | Transmitted |
2020-05-19 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 202 Yeas 103 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2020-05-19 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-05-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-05-13 | House | Substitute (h-4) Adopted |
2020-05-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-05-07 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-05-07 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-4) |
2020-01-29 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/29/2020 |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2020-01-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-01-28 | House | Introduced By Representative Rebekah Warren |
Subjects
Education: intermediate school districts
Education: nonpublic
Education: public school academies
Education: reports
Education: school districts
Education: students
Health: emergency services
Education: nonpublic
Education: public school academies
Education: reports
Education: school districts
Education: students
Health: emergency services