MI HB5407 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Assigned Pa 153'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Assigned Pa 153'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Crime victims; statements; presence of defendant during presentation of victim oral impact statements; require. Amends secs. 15, 43 & 75 of 1985 PA 87 (MCL 780.765 et seq.).
Title
Crime victims; statements; presence of defendant during presentation of victim oral impact statements; require. Amends secs. 15, 43 & 75 of 1985 PA 87 (MCL 780.765 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-15 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 281 (Y: 105 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 283 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 145 (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 283 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 145 (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | House | Assigned Pa 153'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-05-23 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 5/23/2018 @ 2:24 Pm |
2018-05-23 | House | Approved By The Governor 5/23/2018 @ 12:44 Pm |
2018-05-17 | House | Presented To The Governor 5/17/2018 @ 12:05 Pm |
2018-05-15 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-05-15 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-05-15 | House | Roll Call # 281 Yeas 105 Nays 3 |
2018-05-15 | House | Senate Substitute S-3 Concurred In |
2018-05-10 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2018-05-10 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-3 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 283 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-3 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Substitute S-3 Concurred In |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-3 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2018-03-08 | House | Transmitted |
2018-03-08 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 145 Yeas 105 Nays 2 |
2018-03-08 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-03-07 | House | Amended |
2018-03-07 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-02-13 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-02-13 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-01-16 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/11/2018 |
2018-01-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Law And Justice |
2018-01-11 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-01-11 | House | Introduced By Representative Holly Hughes |