MI HB5404 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-09 - Re-referred To Committee On Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-09 - Re-referred To Committee On Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Education: other; student opportunity scholarship accounts; create. Creates new act.
Title
Education: other; student opportunity scholarship accounts; create. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 409 (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-10-19 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 477 (Y: 55 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-19 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 477 (Y: 55 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-09 | House | Re-referred To Committee On Education |
2021-11-09 | House | Vetoed By The Governor 11/05/2021 |
2021-11-02 | House | Presented To The Governor 10/29/2021 11:06 Am |
2021-10-26 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2021-10-26 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 409 Yeas 19 Nays 15 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education And Career Readiness |
2021-10-19 | House | Transmitted |
2021-10-19 | House | Title Amended |
2021-10-19 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 477 Yeas 55 Nays 48 Excused 0 Not Voting 6 |
2021-10-19 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-10-19 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2021-10-19 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-10-19 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2021-10-19 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-10-19 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-10-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-10-19 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/14/2021 |
2021-10-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2021-10-14 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-10-14 | House | Introduced By Representative Bryan Posthumus |