MI HB5391 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-11 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-11 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Labor; fair employment practices; deductions from wages without written consent of employee; include certain reimbursements related to garnishment. Amends sec. 7 of 1978 PA 390 (MCL 408.477). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5390'14
Title
Labor; fair employment practices; deductions from wages without written consent of employee; include certain reimbursements related to garnishment. Amends sec. 7 of 1978 PA 390 (MCL 408.477). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5390'14
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 486 (Y: 102 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 486 (Y: 102 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-09-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Reforms, Restructuring And Reinventing |
2014-09-18 | House | Transmitted |
2014-09-18 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 486 Yeas 102 Nays 7 |
2014-09-18 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-09-17 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-09-17 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2014-09-17 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-09-10 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-09-10 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2014-03-06 | House | Printed Bill Filed 03/06/2014 |
2014-03-05 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce |
2014-03-05 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-03-05 | House | Introduced By Representative Michael Mccready |