MI HB5379 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-15 - Assigned Pa 243'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-15 - Assigned Pa 243'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Education; safety; possession and application of sunscreen at school; allow. Amends sec. 1179 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1179).
Title
Education; safety; possession and application of sunscreen at school; allow. Amends sec. 1179 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1179).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 454 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 107 (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 107 (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-15 | House | Assigned Pa 243'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-08-15 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/28/2018 @ 2:18 Pm |
2018-08-15 | House | Approved By The Governor 6/27/2018 @ 9:26 Pm |
2018-08-15 | House | Presented To The Governor 6/25/2018 @ 3:18 Pm |
2018-06-12 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-06-12 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-06-12 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 454 Yeas 35 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education |
2018-02-28 | House | Transmitted |
2018-02-28 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 107 Yeas 108 Nays 1 |
2018-02-28 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-02-22 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-02-22 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2018-02-22 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-02-08 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-02-08 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2018-01-11 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/10/2018 |
2018-01-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Education Reform |
2018-01-10 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-01-10 | House | Introduced By Representative Kevin Hertel |