MI HB5357 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-10 - Per Rule 41 Referred To Committee On Insurance And Financial Services
Pending: House Insurance And Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-10 - Per Rule 41 Referred To Committee On Insurance And Financial Services
Pending: House Insurance And Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Environmental protection: other; citations to the motor vehicle sales finance act in the natural resources and environmental protection act; revise. Amends sec. 20101 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.20101). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5354'23
Title
Environmental protection: other; citations to the motor vehicle sales finance act in the natural resources and environmental protection act; revise. Amends sec. 20101 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.20101). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5354'23
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-10 | House | Per Rule 41 Referred To Committee On Insurance And Financial Services |
2023-12-31 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 11/14/2023 |
2023-11-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2023-11-14 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-11-14 | House | Introduced By Representative Jasper Martus |
Same As/Similar To
HB5354 (Same As) 2024-01-10 - Per Rule 41 Referred To Committee On Insurance And Financial Services
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/Bills/Bill?ObjectName=2023-HB-5357 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billintroduced/House/htm/2023-HIB-5357.htm |