MI HB5334 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-14 - Assigned Pa 212'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-14 - Assigned Pa 212'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Highways: memorial; portion of US-10; designate as the "Cpl. Casey P. Zylman Memorial Highway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2084) by adding sec. 16d.
Title
Highways: memorial; portion of US-10; designate as the "Cpl. Casey P. Zylman Memorial Highway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2084) by adding sec. 16d.
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Hauck [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 388 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 286 (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 286 (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-14 | House | Assigned Pa 212'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-10-14 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/15/2020 12:36 Pm |
2020-10-14 | House | Approved By The Governor 10/15/2020 10:06 Am |
2020-10-01 | House | Presented To The Governor 10/05/2020 03:30 Pm |
2020-10-01 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-10-01 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-10-01 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 388 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-09-30 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2020-09-30 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2020-06-24 | House | Transmitted |
2020-06-24 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 286 Yeas 106 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2020-06-24 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-06-24 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-06-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-06-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-06-24 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-06-24 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2020-06-16 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2020-01-16 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/16/2020 |
2020-01-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2020-01-15 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-01-15 | House | Introduced By Representative Roger Hauck |