MI HB5297 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-1)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - Assigned Pa 279'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-1)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - Assigned Pa 279'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; absent voters; federal write-in absentee ballot; expand to include state and local candidates and ballot questions, and include certain reporting requirements for local clerks. Amends sec. 759a of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.759a).
Title
Elections; absent voters; federal write-in absentee ballot; expand to include state and local candidates and ballot questions, and include certain reporting requirements for local clerks. Amends sec. 759a of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.759a).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-14 - House - House Third Reading: Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 474 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 508 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 119 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 508 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 119 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-18 | House | Assigned Pa 279'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-07-18 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 7/3/2012 @ 12:10 Pm |
2012-07-18 | House | Approved By The Governor 6/26/2012 @ 7:54 Am |
2012-07-18 | House | Presented To The Governor 6/21/2012 @ 3:48 Pm |
2012-06-14 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2012-06-14 | House | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-06-14 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-06-14 | House | Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 474 Yeas 110 Nays 0 |
2012-06-13 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2012-06-13 | House | Returned From Senate With Amendment(s) With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2012-06-13 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2012-06-13 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 508 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2012-06-13 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-06-13 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-06-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Amendment(s) |
2012-06-13 | Senate | Amendment(s) Concurred In |
2012-06-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Amendment(s) |
2012-06-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2012-06-13 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2012-03-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Local Government And Elections |
2012-03-15 | House | Transmitted |
2012-03-15 | House | Passed Roll Call # 119 Yeas 107 Nays 0 |
2012-03-15 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-03-14 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-03-14 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2012-03-14 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-03-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-03-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2012-01-31 | House | Printed Bill Filed 01/27/2012 |
2012-01-26 | House | Referred To Committee On Redistricting And Elections |
2012-01-26 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-01-26 | House | Introduced By Representative Rick Outman |
Subjects
Elections, absent voters
Elections, ballots
Elections, election officials
Elections, voters
Military affairs, other
State agencies (existing), state
Elections, ballots
Elections, election officials
Elections, voters
Military affairs, other
State agencies (existing), state