MI HB5290 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-12 - Recommendation Concurred In
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-12 - Recommendation Concurred In
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Businesses; business corporations; processing of certificate to renew assumed name and fee; revise. Amends secs. 217 & 1060 of 1972 PA 284 (MCL 450.1217 & 450.2060).
Title
Businesses; business corporations; processing of certificate to renew assumed name and fee; revise. Amends secs. 217 & 1060 of 1972 PA 284 (MCL 450.1217 & 450.2060).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-09-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Appropriations (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-12 | House | Recommendation Concurred In |
2012-09-12 | House | Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Appropriations |
2012-01-31 | House | Printed Bill Filed 01/27/2012 |
2012-01-26 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce |
2012-01-26 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-01-26 | House | Introduced By Representative Thomas Hooker |