MI HB5286 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Weapons: other; local government adopting or enforcing an ordinance more restrictive than state law related to knives; prohibit. Creates new act.
Title
Weapons: other; local government adopting or enforcing an ordinance more restrictive than state law related to knives; prohibit. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 157 (Y: 71 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2020-03-12 | House | Transmitted |
2020-03-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 157 Yeas 71 Nays 36 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2020-03-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-03-11 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-03-10 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2019-12-10 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 12/10/2019 |
2019-12-05 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2019-12-05 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-12-05 | House | Introduced By Representative Steven Johnson |