MI HB5284 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - Assigned Pa 26'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Property; conveyances; transfer of certain state-owned property in Saginaw County; provide for. Creates land transfer act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property; conveyances; transfer of certain state-owned property in Saginaw County; provide for. Creates land transfer act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-31 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 43 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 52 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 11 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-14HouseAssigned Pa 26'18 With Immediate Effect
2018-02-14HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 2/14/2018 @ 1:58 Pm
2018-02-14HouseApproved By The Governor 2/12/2018 @ 11:06 Am
2018-02-06HousePresented To The Governor 2/2/2018 @ 3:37 Pm
2018-01-31HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2018-01-31House Roll Call # 43 Yeas 109 Nays 0
2018-01-31HouseSenate Substitute S-1 Concurred In By 2/3 Vote
2018-01-31HouseRule Suspended
2018-01-31HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2018-01-31HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect
2018-01-31SenatePassed By 2/3 Vote; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 52 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2018-01-30SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1
2018-01-30SenateSubstitute S-1 Concurred In
2018-01-30SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1
2018-01-25SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
2018-01-25SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2018-01-25SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-1
2018-01-23SenateReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2018-01-17HouseTransmitted
2018-01-17HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 11 Yeas 108 Nays 0
2018-01-17HouseRead A Third Time
2018-01-16HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-01-16HouseSubstitute H-1 Adopted
2018-01-16HouseRead A Second Time
2017-12-06HouseReferred To Second Reading
2017-12-06HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1
2017-11-30HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 11/29/2017
2017-11-29HouseReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2017-11-29HouseRead A First Time
2017-11-29HouseIntroduced By Representative Vanessa Guerra

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2017-HB-5284
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/House/htm/2017-HIB-5284.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2017-HEBH-5284.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2017-HEBS-5284.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/House/htm/2017-HNB-5284.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/publicact/htm/2018-PA-0026.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2017-HJ-12-06-094.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-01-17-004.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-01-25-008.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-01-31-010.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-01-31-010.htm

Bill Comments

feedback