MI HB5277 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-5)
Status: Introduced on October 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-13 - Placed On Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Military affairs: other; office of mental health; establish within the Michigan veterans affairs agency. Amends 1967 PA 150 (MCL 32.501 - 32.851) by adding sec. 322. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5276'23, HB 5279'23, HB 5280'23, HB 5720'24

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Military affairs: other; office of mental health; establish within the Michigan veterans affairs agency. Amends 1967 PA 150 (MCL 32.501 - 32.851) by adding sec. 322. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5276'23, HB 5279'23, HB 5280'23, HB 5720'24

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-13HousePlaced On Third Reading
2024-06-13HouseSubstitute (h-2) Adopted
2024-06-13HouseRead A Second Time
2024-06-11HouseReferred To Second Reading
2024-06-11HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2)
2023-10-31HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 10/26/2023
2023-10-26HouseReferred To Committee On Military, Veterans And Homeland Security
2023-10-26HouseRead A First Time
2023-10-26HouseIntroduced By Representative Christine Morse

Same As/Similar To

HB5276 (Same As) 2024-06-13 - Placed On Third Reading
HB5280 (Same As) 2024-06-13 - Placed On Third Reading
HB5279 (Same As) 2024-06-13 - Placed On Third Reading
HB5720 (Same As) 2024-06-13 - Placed On Third Reading

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback