MI HB5276 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-5)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-25 - Referred To Committee On Veterans And Emergency Services
Pending: Senate Veterans And Emergency Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Military affairs: other; office of mental health; establish within the Michigan department of military and veterans affairs. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5277'23, HB 5279'23, HB 5280'23, HB 5720'24

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Military affairs: other; office of mental health; establish within the Michigan department of military and veterans affairs. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5277'23, HB 5279'23, HB 5280'23, HB 5720'24

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 181 (Y: 89 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-25SenateReferred To Committee On Veterans And Emergency Services
2024-06-20HouseTransmitted
2024-06-20HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 181 Yeas 89 Nays 20 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
2024-06-20HouseRead A Third Time
2024-06-13HousePlaced On Third Reading
2024-06-13HouseSubstitute (h-1) Adopted
2024-06-13HouseRead A Second Time
2024-06-11HouseReferred To Second Reading
2024-06-11HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
2023-10-31HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 10/26/2023
2023-10-26HouseReferred To Committee On Military, Veterans And Homeland Security
2023-10-26HouseRead A First Time
2023-10-26HouseIntroduced By Representative Jennifer Conlin

Same As/Similar To

HB5280 (Same As) 2024-06-25 - Referred To Committee On Veterans And Emergency Services
HB5277 (Same As) 2024-06-25 - Referred To Committee On Veterans And Emergency Services
HB5279 (Same As) 2024-06-25 - Referred To Committee On Veterans And Emergency Services
HB5720 (Same As) 2024-06-25 - Referred To Committee On Veterans And Emergency Services

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://legislature.mi.gov/Bills/Bill?ObjectName=2023-HB-5276
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billintroduced/House/htm/2023-HIB-5276.htm
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billengrossed/House/htm/2023-HEBH-5276.htm
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/House/pdf/2023-HLA-5276-90D9208A.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/House/pdf/2023-HLA-4921-B6F2BD31.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/House/pdf/2023-HLA-5276-3F23BA7B.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/House/pdf/2023-HLA-5276-58BD1648.pdf
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/House/htm/2024-HJ-06-11-052.htm
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/House/htm/2024-HJ-06-20-056.htm

Bill Comments

feedback