MI HB5267 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-19 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-19 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Individual income tax; rate; conditional rollback of rate; provide for. Amends sec. 51 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.51).
Title
Individual income tax; rate; conditional rollback of rate; provide for. Amends sec. 51 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.51).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-19 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-02-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2014-01-30 | House | Printed Bill Filed 01/29/2014 |
2014-01-29 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2014-01-29 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-01-29 | House | Introduced By Representative Jeff Farrington |