MI HB5262 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Assigned Pa 42'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Assigned Pa 42'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance: health insurers; providing insured a nonopioid directive form; require. Amends 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.100 - 500.8302) by adding sec. 3406y.
Title
Insurance: health insurers; providing insured a nonopioid directive form; require. Amends 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.100 - 500.8302) by adding sec. 3406y.
Sponsors
Rep. Abdullah Hammoud [D] | Rep. Pamela Hornberger [R] | Rep. Mary Whiteford [R] | Rep. Abraham Aiyash [D] |
Rep. Jeffrey Yaroch [R] | Sen. Mary Cavanagh [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 117 (Y: 93 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 73 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-01 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 562 (Y: 91 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 73 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-01 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 562 (Y: 91 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | House | Assigned Pa 42'22 With Immediate Effect |
2022-03-23 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 03/23/2022 10:52 Am |
2022-03-23 | House | Approved By The Governor 03/23/2022 09:49 Am |
2022-03-16 | House | Presented To The Governor 03/16/2022 03:42 Pm |
2022-03-15 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2022-03-15 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2022-03-15 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 117 Yeas 93 Nays 10 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2022-03-15 | House | Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2022-03-10 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2022-03-10 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 73 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services |
2021-12-01 | House | Transmitted |
2021-12-01 | House | Title Amended |
2021-12-01 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 562 Yeas 91 Nays 9 Excused 0 Not Voting 7 |
2021-12-01 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-11-10 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-11-10 | House | Substitute (h-3) Adopted |
2021-11-10 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2021-11-10 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-11-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-11-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2021-08-18 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 08/17/2021 |
2021-08-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2021-08-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-08-17 | House | Introduced By Representative Abdullah Hammoud |