MI HB5261 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Assigned Pa 132'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Property tax; exemptions; filings for certain personal property exemptions; modify dates. Amends sec. 9o of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.9o).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property tax; exemptions; filings for certain personal property exemptions; modify dates. Amends sec. 9o of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.9o).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 205 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 82 (Y: 106 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03HouseAssigned Pa 132'18 With Immediate Effect
2018-05-03HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 5/3/2018 @ 11:40 Am
2018-05-03HouseApproved By The Governor 5/2/2018 @ 8:54 Pm
2018-04-24HousePresented To The Governor 4/23/2018 @ 12:32 Pm
2018-04-17HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2018-04-17HouseFull Title Agreed To
2018-04-17HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2018-04-17SenateInserted Full Title
2018-04-17SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 205 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2018-04-12SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2018-04-12SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2018-03-22SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2018-03-22SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2018-03-22SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2018-02-20SenateReferred To Committee On Finance
2018-02-15HouseTransmitted
2018-02-15HouseTitle Amended
2018-02-15HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 82 Yeas 106 Nays 3
2018-02-15HouseRead A Third Time
2018-02-14HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-02-14HouseSubstitute H-2 Adopted
2018-02-14HouseRead A Second Time
2018-02-07HouseReferred To Second Reading
2018-02-07HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2
2017-11-29HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 11/28/2017
2017-11-28HouseReferred To Committee On Tax Policy
2017-11-28HouseRead A First Time
2017-11-28HouseIntroduced By Representative Jim Tedder

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2017-HB-5261
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/House/htm/2017-HIB-5261.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2017-HEBH-5261.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2017-HEBS-5261.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/House/htm/2017-HNB-5261.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/publicact/htm/2018-PA-0132.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-02-07-013.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-02-15-017.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-03-22-032.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-04-17-036.htm

Bill Comments

feedback