MI HB5258 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 14 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Elections: candidates; transmission of proof copies of the ballot to candidates; allow clerks to email. Amends secs. 565, 710 & 711 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.565 et seq.).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections: candidates; transmission of proof copies of the ballot to candidates; allow clerks to email. Amends secs. 565, 710 & 711 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.565 et seq.).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-24 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 614 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-24SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2022-03-24SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2022-03-24SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2022-01-12SenateReferred To Committee On Elections
2021-12-14HouseTransmitted
2021-12-14HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 614 Yeas 102 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 5
2021-12-14HouseRead A Third Time
2021-12-14HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2021-12-14HousePlaced On Third Reading
2021-12-14HouseSubstitute (h-1) Adopted
2021-12-14HouseRead A Second Time
2021-09-28HouseReferred To Second Reading
2021-09-28HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
2021-08-18HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 08/17/2021
2021-08-17HouseReferred To Committee On Elections And Ethics
2021-08-17HouseRead A First Time
2021-08-17HouseIntroduced By Representative Matt Koleszar

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2021-HB-5258
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billintroduced/House/htm/2021-HIB-5258.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/House/htm/2021-HEBH-5258.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-HCVBS-5258-0N295.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-5258-9EFC34BE.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-5258-3734EE01.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-5258-5E3883A9.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-5258-1B1708AB.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-5258-3B3F5EFC.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-5258-2A3E6488.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-5258-L.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-5258-F.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-09-28-076.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-12-14-102.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2022-SJ-03-24-031.htm

Bill Comments

feedback