MI HB5258 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Assigned Pa 96'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for possession with intent to use ransomware without authorization; enact. Amends sec. 16t, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.16t). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5257'17

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for possession with intent to use ransomware without authorization; enact. Amends sec. 16t, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.16t). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5257'17

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 172 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 27 (Y: 103 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10HouseAssigned Pa 96'18 With Immediate Effect
2018-04-10HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 4/2/2018 @ 4:12 Pm
2018-04-10HouseApproved By The Governor 4/2/2018 @ 12:05 Pm
2018-04-10HousePresented To The Governor 3/26/2018 @ 1:00 Pm
2018-03-21HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2018-03-21HouseFull Title Agreed To
2018-03-21HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2018-03-21SenateInserted Full Title
2018-03-21SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 172 Yeas 34 Nays 0 Excused 3 Not Voting 0
2018-03-20SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2018-03-20SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2018-03-08SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2018-03-08SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2018-03-08SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2018-01-30SenateReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2018-01-25HouseTransmitted
2018-01-25HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 27 Yeas 103 Nays 3
2018-01-25HouseRead A Third Time
2018-01-24HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-01-24HouseSubstitute H-1 Adopted
2018-01-24HouseRead A Second Time
2018-01-16HouseReferred To Second Reading
2018-01-16HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1
2017-11-29HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 11/28/2017
2017-11-28HouseReferred To Committee On Communications And Technology
2017-11-28HouseRead A First Time
2017-11-28HouseIntroduced By Representative James Lower

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2017-HB-5258
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/House/htm/2017-HIB-5258.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2017-HEBH-5258.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2017-HEBS-5258.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/House/htm/2017-HNB-5258.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/publicact/htm/2018-PA-0096.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-01-16-003.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-01-25-008.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-03-08-026.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-03-21-031.htm

Bill Comments

feedback