MI HB5246 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-15 - Assigned Pa 290'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-15 - Assigned Pa 290'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development; local development financing; number of smart zones; increase. Amends secs. 2, 3, 4, 11b, 12, 12a, 12c & 12c[1] of 1986 PA 281 (MCL 125.2152 et seq.).
Title
Economic development; local development financing; number of smart zones; increase. Amends secs. 2, 3, 4, 11b, 12, 12a, 12c & 12c[1] of 1986 PA 281 (MCL 125.2152 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-07-18 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 504 (Y: 86 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 599 (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 547 (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-14 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 390 (Y: 87 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 599 (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 547 (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-14 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 390 (Y: 87 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-15 | House | Assigned Pa 290'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-08-15 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 8/1/2012 @ 2:12 Pm |
2012-08-15 | House | Approved By The Governor 8/1/2012 @ 9:22 Am |
2012-08-15 | House | Presented To The Governor 7/26/2012 @ 2:34 Pm |
2012-07-18 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2012-07-18 | House | Re-returned From Senate With Concurrence To House Amendment(s) To Senate Substitute S-1 |
2012-07-18 | House | Retransmitted |
2012-07-18 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-07-18 | House | Roll Call # 504 Yeas 86 Nays 23 |
2012-07-18 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In As Amended |
2012-07-18 | House | Amended |
2012-07-18 | Senate | Roll Call # 599 Yeas 26 Nays 10 Excused 1 Not Voting 1 |
2012-07-18 | Senate | House Amendment(s) To Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2012-07-18 | Senate | Returned From House With Amendment(s) To Senate Substitute S-1 |
2012-06-14 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2012-06-14 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 547 Yeas 28 Nays 8 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2012-06-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic Development |
2012-06-07 | House | Transmitted |
2012-06-07 | House | Title Amended |
2012-06-07 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 390 Yeas 87 Nays 20 |
2012-06-07 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-06-07 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-06-07 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-06-07 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted And Amended |
2012-06-07 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-05-24 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-05-24 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2012-01-18 | House | Printed Bill Filed 01/18/2012 |
2012-01-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce |
2012-01-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-01-17 | House | Introduced By Representative Wayne Schmidt |