MI HB5246 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-12-01 - Assigned Pa 149'09 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-12-01 - Assigned Pa 149'09 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Cemeteries and funerals; burial or cremation; funeral director liable for properly disposing of unclaimed cremated remains; grant immunity. Amends title of 1980 PA 299 (MCL 339.101 - 339.2919) & adds sec. 1809a. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5245'09
Title
Cemeteries and funerals; burial or cremation; funeral director liable for properly disposing of unclaimed cremated remains; grant immunity. Amends title of 1980 PA 299 (MCL 339.101 - 339.2919) & adds sec. 1809a. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5245'09
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-10-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-12-01 | Assigned Pa 149'09 With Immediate Effect | |
2009-12-01 | Filed With Secretary Of State 11/19/2009 @ 2:23 Pm | |
2009-12-01 | Approved By The Governor 11/19/2009 @ 1:11 Pm | |
2009-11-18 | Presented To The Governor 11/16/2009 @ 10:36 Am | |
2009-11-12 | Bill Ordered Enrolled | |
2009-11-12 | Re-returned From Senate With Concurrence To House Amendment(s) To Senate Substitute S-1 | |
2009-11-12 | Roll Call # 596 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 | |
2009-11-12 | House Amendment(s) To Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In | |
2009-11-12 | Returned From House With Amendment(s) To Senate Substitute S-1 | |
2009-11-10 | Retransmitted | |
2009-11-10 | Title Amendment Agreed To | |
2009-11-10 | Roll Call # 541 Yeas 100 Nays 0 | |
2009-11-10 | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In As Amended | |
2009-11-10 | Amended | |
2009-11-05 | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules | |
2009-11-05 | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment | |
2009-11-05 | Inserted Full Title | |
2009-11-05 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 576 Yeas 34 Nays 0 Excused 3 Not Voting 0 | |
2009-11-05 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-11-05 | Rules Suspended | |
2009-11-05 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-11-05 | Substitute S-1 Concurred In | |
2009-11-05 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2009-10-08 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | |
2009-10-08 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2009-10-08 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | |
2009-09-15 | Referred To Committee On Senior Citizens And Veterans Affairs | |
2009-09-10 | Transmitted | |
2009-09-10 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 421 Yeas 105 Nays 0 | |
2009-09-10 | Read A Third Time | |
2009-09-10 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-09-10 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2009-09-10 | Substitute H-1 Adopted | |
2009-09-10 | Read A Second Time | |
2009-08-26 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2009-08-26 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 | |
2009-08-26 | Printed Bill Filed 08/20/2009 | |
2009-08-19 | Referred To Committee On Military And Veterans Affairs And Homeland Security | |
2009-08-19 | Read A First Time | |
2009-08-19 | Introduced By Representative Kenneth Kurtz |
Subjects
Cemeteries and funerals, burial or cremation
Probate, wills and estates
State agencies (existing), energy, labor, and economic growth
Torts, liability
Probate, wills and estates
State agencies (existing), energy, labor, and economic growth
Torts, liability