MI HB5236 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Assigned Pa 81'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Assigned Pa 81'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Occupations; accounting; certified public accountants; continuing education requirements; modify, and make other general revisions. Amends secs. 720, 721, 724, 727a, 728, 729 & 734a of 1980 PA 299 (MCL 339.720 et seq.).
Title
Occupations; accounting; certified public accountants; continuing education requirements; modify, and make other general revisions. Amends secs. 720, 721, 724, 727a, 728, 729 & 734a of 1980 PA 299 (MCL 339.720 et seq.).
Sponsors
Rep. Brandt Iden [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 143 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 492 (Y: 102 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 492 (Y: 102 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | House | Assigned Pa 81'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-03-20 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 3/19/2018 @ 1:32 Pm |
2018-03-20 | House | Approved By The Governor 3/19/2018 @ 12:01 Pm |
2018-03-13 | House | Presented To The Governor 3/12/2018 @ 2:32 Pm |
2018-03-08 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-03-08 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-03-08 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 143 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2017-12-13 | House | Transmitted |
2017-12-13 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 492 Yeas 102 Nays 8 |
2017-12-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-12-13 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2017-12-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-12-13 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2017-12-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-12-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-12-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2017-11-28 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 11/09/2017 |
2017-11-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2017-11-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-11-09 | House | Introduced By Representative Brandt Iden |
Subjects
Occupations: accounting
Occupations: individual licensing and regulation
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
Occupations: individual licensing and regulation
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs