MI HB5236 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-27 - Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/26/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-27 - Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/26/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Education; teachers; teacher engaging in a prohibited strike; require suspension of teaching certificate. Amends 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1 - 380.1852) by adding sec. 1535b.
Title
Education; teachers; teacher engaging in a prohibited strike; require suspension of teaching certificate. Amends 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1 - 380.1852) by adding sec. 1535b.
Sponsors
Rep. Amanda Price [R] | Rep. Tim Kelly [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-27 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/26/2016 |
2016-01-26 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2016-01-26 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-01-26 | House | Introduced By Representative Amanda Price |
Same As/Similar To
SB0714 (Same As) 2016-02-03 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
Subjects
Education: employees
Education: teachers
Labor: public service employment
Labor: public service labor disputes
State agencies (existing): education
Education: teachers
Labor: public service employment
Labor: public service labor disputes
State agencies (existing): education
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2016-HB-5236 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2015-2016/billintroduced/House/htm/2016-HIB-5236.htm |