MI HB5227 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Assigned Pa 94'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Agriculture; regulation; seed potato standards for distributing, growing, and planting; require to comply with the national harmonization program. Creates new act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agriculture; regulation; seed potato standards for distributing, growing, and planting; require to comply with the national harmonization program. Creates new act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 145 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 6 (Y: 102 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10HouseAssigned Pa 94'18 With Immediate Effect
2018-04-10HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 3/26/2018 @ 3:16 Pm
2018-04-10HouseApproved By The Governor 3/26/2018 @ 12:24 Pm
2018-03-20HousePresented To The Governor 3/19/2018 @ 9:52 Am
2018-03-14HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2018-03-14HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect
2018-03-14SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 145 Yeas 34 Nays 1 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
2018-03-08SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2018-03-08SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2018-02-28SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2018-02-28SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2018-02-28SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2018-01-17SenateReferred To Committee On Agriculture
2018-01-16HouseTransmitted
2018-01-16HouseTitle Amended
2018-01-16HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 6 Yeas 102 Nays 5
2018-01-16HouseRead A Third Time
2018-01-11HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-01-11HouseSubstitute H-1 Adopted And Amended
2018-01-11HouseRead A Second Time
2017-12-13HouseReferred To Second Reading
2017-12-13HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1
2017-11-09HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 11/08/2017
2017-11-08HouseReferred To Committee On Agriculture
2017-11-08HouseRead A First Time
2017-11-08HouseIntroduced By Representative Roger Victory

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2017-HB-5227
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/House/htm/2017-HIB-5227.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2017-HEBH-5227.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2017-HEBS-5227.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/House/htm/2017-HNB-5227.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/publicact/htm/2018-PA-0094.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2017-HJ-12-13-097.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-01-16-003.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-02-28-022.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-03-14-028.htm

Bill Comments

feedback