MI HB5224 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-16 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-16 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Occupations; barbers; education and training requirements for cosmetology and barber licensing; revise. Amends secs. 1110 & 1205 of 1980 PA 299 (MCL 339.1110 & 339.1205).
Title
Occupations; barbers; education and training requirements for cosmetology and barber licensing; revise. Amends secs. 1110 & 1205 of 1980 PA 299 (MCL 339.1110 & 339.1205).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-16 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-05-16 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2017-11-08 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 11/07/2017 |
2017-11-07 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2017-11-07 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-11-07 | House | Introduced By Representative Jeff Yaroch |
Subjects
Occupations: barbers
Occupations: cosmetologists
Occupations: individual licensing and regulation
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
Occupations: cosmetologists
Occupations: individual licensing and regulation
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs