MI HB5222 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on October 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-25 - Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/24/2023
Pending: House Energy, Communications, And Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-25 - Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/24/2023
Pending: House Energy, Communications, And Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Public utilities: electric utilities; engineering audits; require. Amends sec. 10p of 1939 PA 3 (MCL 460.10p) & adds sec. 6y. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5216'23, HB 5220'23, HB 5221'23, HB 5217'23, HB 5219'23
Title
Public utilities: electric utilities; engineering audits; require. Amends sec. 10p of 1939 PA 3 (MCL 460.10p) & adds sec. 6y. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5216'23, HB 5220'23, HB 5221'23, HB 5217'23, HB 5219'23
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-25 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/24/2023 |
2023-10-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Energy, Communications, And Technology |
2023-10-24 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-10-24 | House | Introduced By Representative Abraham Aiyash |
Same As/Similar To
HB5216 (Same As) 2023-11-08 - Referred To Second Reading
HB5220 (Same As) 2023-11-08 - Referred To Second Reading
HB5221 (Same As) 2023-11-08 - Referred To Second Reading
HB5217 (Same As) 2023-10-25 - Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/24/2023
HB5219 (Same As) 2023-10-25 - Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/24/2023
HB5220 (Same As) 2023-11-08 - Referred To Second Reading
HB5221 (Same As) 2023-11-08 - Referred To Second Reading
HB5217 (Same As) 2023-10-25 - Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/24/2023
HB5219 (Same As) 2023-10-25 - Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/24/2023
Subjects
Public utilities: electric utilities
Public utilities: natural gas utilities
Public utilities: public service commission
Public utilities: natural gas utilities
Public utilities: public service commission