MI HB5220 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Assigned Pa 98'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Weapons; other; purchase and possession of certain self-defense spray concentration; allow under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 224d of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.224d).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Weapons; other; purchase and possession of certain self-defense spray concentration; allow under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 224d of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.224d).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 168 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 80 (Y: 88 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10HouseAssigned Pa 98'18 With Immediate Effect
2018-04-10HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 4/2/2018 @ 4:16 Pm
2018-04-10HouseApproved By The Governor 4/2/2018 @ 11:52 Am
2018-04-10HousePresented To The Governor 3/26/2018 @ 12:48 Pm
2018-03-20HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2018-03-20HouseFull Title Agreed To
2018-03-20HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2018-03-20SenateInserted Full Title
2018-03-20SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 168 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
2018-03-15SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2018-03-15SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2018-03-08SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2018-03-08SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2018-03-08SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2018-02-20SenateReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2018-02-15HouseTransmitted
2018-02-15HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 80 Yeas 88 Nays 21
2018-02-15HouseRead A Third Time
2018-02-14HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-02-14HouseRead A Second Time
2018-02-07HouseReferred To Second Reading
2018-02-07HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2017-11-07HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 11/02/2017
2017-11-02HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2017-11-02HouseRead A First Time
2017-11-02HouseIntroduced By Representative Michele Hoitenga

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2017-HB-5220
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/House/htm/2017-HIB-5220.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2017-HEBH-5220.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2017-HEBS-5220.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/House/htm/2017-HNB-5220.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/publicact/htm/2018-PA-0098.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-02-07-013.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-02-15-017.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-03-08-026.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-03-20-030.htm

Bill Comments

feedback