MI HB5209 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-13 - Referred To Committee On Elections And Government Reform
Pending: Senate Elections And Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-13 - Referred To Committee On Elections And Government Reform
Pending: Senate Elections And Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; campaign practices; organizations employing an individual as a petition signature gatherer if that individual has been convicted of an election crime; prohibit. Amends 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.1 - 168.992) by adding secs. 484a & 956a.
Title
Elections; campaign practices; organizations employing an individual as a petition signature gatherer if that individual has been convicted of an election crime; prohibit. Amends 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.1 - 168.992) by adding secs. 484a & 956a.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeremy Moss [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 824 (Y: 104 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Elections And Government Reform |
2018-12-12 | House | Transmitted |
2018-12-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 824 Yeas 104 Nays 5 |
2018-12-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-12-12 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-12 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-12-12 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2018-12-12 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-12-12 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-12-12 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-11-02 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 11/01/2017 |
2017-11-01 | House | Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics |
2017-11-01 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-11-01 | House | Introduced By Representative Jeremy Moss |