MI HB5195 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-21 - Assigned Pa 102'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-21 - Assigned Pa 102'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicles; registration plates; fees for the transfer of registration plates from 1 vehicle to another; modify. Amends sec. 809 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.809). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5313'19
Title
Vehicles; registration plates; fees for the transfer of registration plates from 1 vehicle to another; modify. Amends sec. 809 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.809). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5313'19
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-17 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 244 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 167 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 33 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 167 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 33 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | House | Assigned Pa 102'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-07-21 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 07/01/2020 12:58 Pm |
2020-07-21 | House | Approved By The Governor 07/01/2020 10:10 Am |
2020-06-23 | House | Presented To The Governor 06/23/2020 10:34 Am |
2020-06-17 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-06-17 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-06-17 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 244 Yeas 108 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2020-06-17 | House | Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2020-06-10 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2020-06-10 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 167 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2020-01-23 | House | Transmitted |
2020-01-23 | House | Title Amended |
2020-01-23 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 33 Yeas 107 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2020-01-23 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-01-22 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-01-22 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2020-01-22 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-01-14 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-01-14 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2019-11-07 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 11/07/2019 |
2019-11-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2019-11-06 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-11-06 | House | Introduced By Representative Jason Sheppard |