MI HB5195 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-08 - Assigned Pa 2'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-08 - Assigned Pa 2'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
School aid; payments; payment of deficit or obligations; require to be paid to the Michigan finance authority. Amends sec. 17a of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1617a). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5194'11
Title
School aid; payments; payment of deficit or obligations; require to be paid to the Michigan finance authority. Amends sec. 17a of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1617a). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5194'11
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-01-19 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 5 (Y: 103 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 834 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-08 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 567 (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 834 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-08 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 567 (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-08 | House | Assigned Pa 2'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-02-08 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 2/7/2012 @ 3:14 Pm |
2012-02-08 | House | Approved By The Governor 2/7/2012 @ 10:14 Am |
2012-01-25 | House | Presented To The Governor 1/24/2012 @ 3:46 Pm |
2012-01-19 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2012-01-19 | House | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-01-19 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-01-19 | House | Roll Call # 5 Yeas 103 Nays 3 |
2012-01-19 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2011-12-15 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2011-12-15 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2011-12-15 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2011-12-15 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 834 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2011-12-15 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2011-12-15 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2011-12-15 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2011-12-15 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2011-12-15 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2011-12-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2011-12-15 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2011-12-15 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2011-12-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2011-12-08 | House | Transmitted |
2011-12-08 | House | Passed Roll Call # 567 Yeas 105 Nays 2 |
2011-12-08 | House | Read A Third Time |
2011-12-08 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2011-12-08 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2011-12-08 | House | Amended |
2011-12-08 | House | Read A Second Time |
2011-12-07 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2011-12-07 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2011-12-06 | House | Printed Bill Filed 12/02/2011 |
2011-12-01 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2011-12-01 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-12-01 | House | Introduced By Representative Fred Durhal |
Same As/Similar To
SB0827 (Same As) 2011-11-29 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Subjects
Education, financing
Education, intermediate school districts
Education, school districts
School aid, payments
Education, intermediate school districts
Education, school districts
School aid, payments