MI HB5180 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Referred To Committee On Outdoor Recreation And Tourism
Pending: Senate Outdoor Recreation And Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Referred To Committee On Outdoor Recreation And Tourism
Pending: Senate Outdoor Recreation And Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Natural resources; hunting; use of pneumatic airbows in certain hunting seasons; allow. Amends secs. 40102, 40103 & 40114 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.40102 et seq.) & adds sec. 40111d.
Title
Natural resources; hunting; use of pneumatic airbows in certain hunting seasons; allow. Amends secs. 40102, 40103 & 40114 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.40102 et seq.) & adds sec. 40111d.
Sponsors
Rep. Beau LaFave [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 167 (Y: 59 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Outdoor Recreation And Tourism |
2018-03-15 | House | Transmitted |
2018-03-15 | House | Reps. Erika Geiss, Jewell Jones, [*] Removed As Co-sponsors |
2018-03-15 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 167 Yeas 59 Nays 47 |
2018-03-15 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-03-14 | House | Substitute H-4 Adopted |
2018-03-14 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-02-21 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-02-21 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 |
2017-10-26 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/25/2017 |
2017-10-25 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources |
2017-10-25 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-10-25 | House | Introduced By Representative Beau Lafave |