MI HB5166 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-17 - Assigned Pa 176'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-17 - Assigned Pa 176'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Controlled substances: opioids; distribution of opioid antagonists by community based-organizations under a standing order; allow and limit certain liability. Amends sec. 17744e of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.17744e).
Title
Controlled substances: opioids; distribution of opioid antagonists by community based-organizations under a standing order; allow and limit certain liability. Amends sec. 17744e of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.17744e).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 370 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 491 (Y: 100 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 491 (Y: 100 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-17 | House | Assigned Pa 176'22 With Immediate Effect |
2022-08-17 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 07/21/2022 11:28 Am |
2022-08-17 | House | Approved By The Governor 07/21/2022 10:04 Am |
2022-07-20 | House | Presented To The Governor 07/11/2022 12:52 Pm |
2022-06-30 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2022-06-30 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2022-06-30 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 370 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services |
2021-10-20 | House | Transmitted |
2021-10-20 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 491 Yeas 100 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 5 |
2021-10-20 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-10-19 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-10-19 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-10-07 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-10-07 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-06-30 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/29/2021 |
2021-06-29 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2021-06-29 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-06-29 | House | Introduced By Representative Mary Whiteford |
Subjects
Controlled substances: opioids
Health: pharmaceuticals
State agencies (existing): health and human services
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
Health: pharmaceuticals
State agencies (existing): health and human services
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs