MI HB5156 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 462'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 462'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance; other; persons authorized to act as adjusters; modify. Amends secs. 1201, 1222 & 1224 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.1201 et seq.).
Title
Insurance; other; persons authorized to act as adjusters; modify. Amends secs. 1201, 1222 & 1224 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.1201 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 978 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 589 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 589 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 462'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/27/2012 @ 3:24 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/22/2012 @ 10:52 Am 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-27 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/20/2012 @ 2:46 Pm |
2012-12-13 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-13 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-12-13 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 978 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2012-12-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2012-12-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-12-06 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-12-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2012-10-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Insurance |
2012-09-27 | House | Transmitted |
2012-09-27 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 589 Yeas 107 Nays 0 |
2012-09-27 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-09-27 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-09-27 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-09-27 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2012-09-27 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-09-20 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-09-20 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2011-11-09 | House | Printed Bill Filed 11/09/2011 |
2011-11-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Insurance |
2011-11-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-11-08 | House | Introduced By Representative Joel Johnson |