MI HB5146 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Introduced on October 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Military, Veterans And Homeland Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Military, Veterans And Homeland Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Military affairs: other; hyperbaric oxygen treatment pilot program; establish. Creates new act.
Title
Military affairs: other; hyperbaric oxygen treatment pilot program; establish. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Military, Veterans And Homeland Security (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | House | Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Military, Veterans And Homeland Security |
2023-10-18 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/17/2023 |
2023-10-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Elections |
2023-10-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-10-17 | House | Introduced By Representative Kathy Schmaltz |