MI HB5144 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-30 - Assigned Pa 10'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-30 - Assigned Pa 10'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Marihuana; facilities; requirements for the issuance of a state operating license; revise, and provide for other general amendments. Amends title & secs. 102, 201, 205, 206, 501, 502, 503, 504, 505, 602 & 801 of 2016 PA 281 (MCL 333.27102 et seq.).
Title
Marihuana; facilities; requirements for the issuance of a state operating license; revise, and provide for other general amendments. Amends title & secs. 102, 201, 205, 206, 501, 502, 503, 504, 505, 602 & 801 of 2016 PA 281 (MCL 333.27102 et seq.).
Sponsors
Rep. Klint Kesto [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-17 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 9 (Y: 95 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 5 (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-12-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-30 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 418 (Y: 95 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 5 (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-12-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-30 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 418 (Y: 95 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-30 | House | Assigned Pa 10'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-01-30 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/26/2018 @ 2:14 Pm |
2018-01-30 | House | Approved By The Governor 1/26/2018 @ 1:06 Pm |
2018-01-24 | House | Presented To The Governor 1/19/2018 @ 3:17 Pm |
2018-01-17 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-01-17 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2018-01-17 | House | Roll Call # 9 Yeas 95 Nays 13 |
2018-01-17 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-01-16 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2018-01-16 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Title Amended |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 5 Yeas 27 Nays 7 Excused 4 Not Voting 0 |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2017-11-30 | House | Transmitted |
2017-11-30 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 418 Yeas 95 Nays 13 |
2017-11-30 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-11-29 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-11-29 | House | Amended |
2017-11-29 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-10-24 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-10-24 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-10-24 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/19/2017 |
2017-10-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Law And Justice |
2017-10-19 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-10-19 | House | Introduced By Representative Klint Kesto |
Subjects
Health: medical marihuana
Marihuana: facilities
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
Marihuana: facilities
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs