MI HB5137 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-22 - Assigned Pa 29'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-22 - Assigned Pa 29'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes; explosives; certain activities with respect to explosive materials; prohibit and provide penalties. Amends 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.1 - 750.568) by adding secs. 204b & 204c.
Title
Crimes; explosives; certain activities with respect to explosive materials; prohibit and provide penalties. Amends 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.1 - 750.568) by adding secs. 204b & 204c.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 63 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-29 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 411 (Y: 104 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-29 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 411 (Y: 104 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | House | Assigned Pa 29'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-02-22 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 2/21/2018 @ 2:50 Pm |
2018-02-22 | House | Approved By The Governor 2/20/2018 @ 12:19 Pm |
2018-02-13 | House | Presented To The Governor 2/9/2018 @ 11:14 Am |
2018-02-06 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-02-06 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-02-06 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 63 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2017-11-29 | House | Transmitted |
2017-11-29 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 411 Yeas 104 Nays 3 |
2017-11-29 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-11-28 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-11-28 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-11-07 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-11-07 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-10-19 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/18/2017 |
2017-10-18 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2017-10-18 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-10-18 | House | Introduced By Representative Steven Johnson |