MI HB5128 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-7)
Status: Introduced on June 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-10-15 - Re-referred To Committee On Agriculture
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Agriculture; animals; animal care advisory council; create. Amends sec. 3 of 1988 PA 466 (MCL 287.703) & adds sec. 7a. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5127'09

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agriculture; animals; animal care advisory council; create. Amends sec. 3 of 1988 PA 466 (MCL 287.703) & adds sec. 7a. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5127'09

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-08-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-10-15 Re-referred To Committee On Agriculture
2009-08-04 Referred To Second Reading
2009-08-04 Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1
2009-06-24 Printed Bill Filed 06/24/2009
2009-06-23 Referred To Committee On Agriculture
2009-06-23 Read A First Time
2009-06-23 Introduced By Representative Jeff Mayes

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback