MI HB5123 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Elections: absent voters; absent voting counting boards in cities and townships with more than 1 election precinct; require. Amends sec. 765a of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.765a).
Title
Elections: absent voters; absent voting counting boards in cities and townships with more than 1 election precinct; require. Amends sec. 765a of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.765a).
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Bollin [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-12-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-01 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-12-01 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-4) |
2020-06-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-10-22 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/22/2019 |
2019-10-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics |
2019-10-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-10-17 | House | Introduced By Representative Ann Bollin |