MI HB5094 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-07 - Assigned Pa 89'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Crime victims: other; statewide trauma system funding from the crime victim's rights fund; modify. Amends sec. 4 of 1989 PA 196 (MCL 780.904).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crime victims: other; statewide trauma system funding from the crime victim's rights fund; modify. Amends sec. 4 of 1989 PA 196 (MCL 780.904).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 357 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-21 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 440 (Y: 81 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-07HouseAssigned Pa 89'21 With Immediate Effect
2021-10-07HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 10/07/2021 02:50 Pm
2021-10-07HouseApproved By The Governor 10/07/2021 02:02 Pm
2021-09-30HousePresented To The Governor 10/01/2021 03:19 Pm
2021-09-30HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2021-09-30HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect
2021-09-30SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 357 Yeas 35 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2021-09-30SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2021-09-30SenateRules Suspended
2021-09-30SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2021-09-30SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2021-09-30SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2021-09-30SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2021-09-30SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2021-09-22SenateReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2021-09-21HouseTransmitted
2021-09-21HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 440 Yeas 81 Nays 23 Excused 0 Not Voting 6
2021-09-21HouseSubstitute (h-2) Adopted
2021-09-14HousePostponed For The Day
2021-09-14HouseRead A Third Time
2021-09-14HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2021-09-14HousePlaced On Third Reading
2021-09-14HouseRead A Second Time
2021-09-14HousePlaced On Second Reading
2021-09-14HouseMotion To Discharge Committee Approved
2021-09-14HouseRule Suspended
2021-06-24HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 06/23/2021
2021-06-23HouseReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2021-06-23HouseRead A First Time
2021-06-23HouseIntroduced By Representative Mary Whiteford

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2021-HB-5094
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billintroduced/House/htm/2021-HIB-5094.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/House/htm/2021-HEBH-5094.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/House/htm/2021-HEBS-5094.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billenrolled/House/htm/2021-HNB-5094.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/publicact/htm/2021-PA-0089.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-HCVBS-5094-0O3313.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-5094-5768C91D.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-5094-C22E0330.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-5094-L.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-5094-F.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-09-21-073.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-09-30-075.htm

Bill Comments

feedback