MI HB5087 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-28 - Assigned Pa 298'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-28 - Assigned Pa 298'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Liquor; other; barrel production limit for breweries to sell beer for on-premises consumption; eliminate. Amends secs. 411, 537 & 603 of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1411 et seq.).
Title
Liquor; other; barrel production limit for breweries to sell beer for on-premises consumption; eliminate. Amends secs. 411, 537 & 603 of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1411 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-12-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 835 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 536 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 536 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-28 | House | Assigned Pa 298'11 With Immediate Effect |
2011-12-28 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/22/2011 @ 3:05 Pm |
2011-12-28 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/21/2011 @ 9:28 Pm |
2011-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/20/2011 @ 2:06 Pm |
2011-12-15 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2011-12-15 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2011-12-15 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2011-12-15 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2011-12-15 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 835 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2011-12-15 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2011-12-15 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2011-12-15 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2011-12-15 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2011-12-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2011-12-15 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2011-12-15 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2011-12-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2011-12-08 | House | Transmitted |
2011-12-08 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 536 Yeas 107 Nays 1 |
2011-12-08 | House | Read A Third Time |
2011-12-07 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2011-12-07 | House | Read A Second Time |
2011-12-07 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2011-12-07 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2011-10-19 | House | Printed Bill Filed 10/19/2011 |
2011-10-18 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2011-10-18 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-10-18 | House | Introduced By Representative Margaret O'brien |