MI HB5073 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-22 - Assigned Pa 16'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-22 - Assigned Pa 16'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Courts; judges; certain district court judgeships; reduce in number. Amends secs. 8125 & 8134 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.8125 & 600.8134).
Title
Courts; judges; certain district court judgeships; reduce in number. Amends secs. 8125 & 8134 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.8125 & 600.8134).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 44 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 539 (Y: 96 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 539 (Y: 96 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-22 | House | Assigned Pa 16'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-02-22 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 2/22/2012 @ 1:03 Pm |
2012-02-22 | House | Approved By The Governor 2/21/2012 @ 8:35 Am |
2012-02-14 | House | Presented To The Governor 2/9/2012 @ 2:24 Pm |
2012-02-07 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2012-02-07 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-02-07 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 44 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2011-12-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2011-12-08 | House | Transmitted |
2011-12-08 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 539 Yeas 96 Nays 12 |
2011-12-08 | House | Read A Third Time |
2011-12-07 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2011-12-07 | House | Read A Second Time |
2011-12-07 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2011-12-07 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2011-10-18 | House | Printed Bill Filed 10/14/2011 |
2011-10-13 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2011-10-13 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-10-13 | House | Introduced By Representative Kevin Cotter |
Same As/Similar To
SB0843 (Same As) 2011-11-29 - Reassigned To Committee On Judiciary