MI HB5071 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-05 - Referred To Committee On Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-05 - Referred To Committee On Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Higher education; financial aid; annual disclosure of certain information concerning federal student loans taken out by each student; require colleges and universities to provide. Creates new act.
Title
Higher education; financial aid; annual disclosure of certain information concerning federal student loans taken out by each student; require colleges and universities to provide. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-11-29 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 408 (Y: 93 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education |
2017-11-29 | House | Transmitted |
2017-11-29 | House | Passed Roll Call # 408 Yeas 93 Nays 14 |
2017-11-29 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-11-09 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-11-09 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted And Amended |
2017-11-09 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-11-02 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-11-02 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2017-10-11 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/10/2017 |
2017-10-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Education Reform |
2017-10-10 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-10-10 | House | Introduced By Representative Thomas Albert |
Subjects
Higher education: community colleges
Higher education: financial aid
Higher education: private schools
Higher education: state universities
Higher education: students
Higher education: financial aid
Higher education: private schools
Higher education: state universities
Higher education: students