MI HB5059 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-31 - Assigned Pa 279'20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-31 - Assigned Pa 279'20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development: brownfield redevelopment authority; capture of certain school operating mills by brownfield redevelopment authorities; reimburse. Amends 1996 PA 381 (MCL 125.2651 - 125.2670) by adding sec. 15b.
Title
Economic development: brownfield redevelopment authority; capture of certain school operating mills by brownfield redevelopment authorities; reimburse. Amends 1996 PA 381 (MCL 125.2651 - 125.2670) by adding sec. 15b.
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Slagh [R] | Sen. Kevin Hertel [D] | Rep. Terry Sabo [D] | Rep. Tommy Brann [R] |
Rep. Rachel Hood [D] | Rep. Julie Calley [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-12-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 551 (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-15 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 384 (Y: 97 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-15 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 384 (Y: 97 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 279'20 |
2020-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/29/2020 01:30 Pm |
2020-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/29/2020 09:40 Am |
2020-12-23 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/22/2020 05:21 Pm |
2020-12-16 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-12-16 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-12-16 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 551 Yeas 32 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2020-09-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic And Small Business Development |
2020-09-15 | House | Transmitted |
2020-09-15 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 384 Yeas 97 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-09-15 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-09-15 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-09-15 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-09-15 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2020-09-15 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-09-09 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-09-09 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2020-02-05 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2019-10-10 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 10/10/2019 |
2019-10-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2019-10-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-10-08 | House | Introduced By Representative Bradley Slagh |
Subjects
Economic development: brownfield redevelopment authority
Education: financing
Education: intermediate school districts
Education: financing
Education: intermediate school districts