MI HB5053 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-24 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-24 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations: supplemental; multidepartment supplemental appropriations; provide for fiscal year 2020-2021. Creates appropriation act. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0303'21, HB 5007'21
Title
Appropriations: supplemental; multidepartment supplemental appropriations; provide for fiscal year 2020-2021. Creates appropriation act. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0303'21, HB 5007'21
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-23 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 370 (Y: 56 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2021-06-23 | House | Transmitted |
2021-06-23 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 370 Yeas 56 Nays 54 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2021-06-23 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-06-23 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2021-06-23 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-06-23 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2021-06-23 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-06-23 | House | Placed On Second Reading |
2021-06-23 | House | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved |
2021-06-23 | House | Rule Suspended |
2021-06-22 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/17/2021 |
2021-06-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2021-06-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-06-17 | House | Introduced By Representative Thomas Albert |